Global Patent Index - EP 1445756 A3

EP 1445756 A3 2009-02-25 - Plasma display device provided with drive means suitable for carrying out rapid charge-equalization operations

Title (en)

Plasma display device provided with drive means suitable for carrying out rapid charge-equalization operations

Title (de)

Plasmabildanzeigevorrichtung mit Treibereinheit zur Ausführung eines schellen Ladungsausgleichs

Title (fr)

DIspositif de visualisation à plasma comprenant des circuits pour égaliser rapidement les charges

Publication

EP 1445756 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 04075385 A

Priority

FR 0301370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: TW200428331A] Conventionally, the drive means are suitable for generating charge-equalization or reset operations, then address operations and then sustain operations: the invention relates to division of the reset operations into two successive steps:.A metastable space charge-generation step P1;.An accelerated charge-generation end step P2 during which the system operates in the mode with weak discharges between the electrodes E1, E2, serving at least for addressing. Thanks to this division, the reset operations may be shortened and the luminous performance of the panel and/or the manufacturing yields of plasma panels may be improved.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/292 (2013.01); G09G 3/294 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2927 (2013.01); G09G 3/2948 (2013.01); G09G 2310/066 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0238 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1445756 A2 20040811; EP 1445756 A3 20090225; CN 100410987 C 20080813; CN 1521716 A 20040818; FR 2851073 A1 20040813; JP 2004240430 A 20040826; JP 4838983 B2 20111214; KR 101049866 B1 20110719; KR 20040071627 A 20040812; TW 200428331 A 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-05-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2015-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON PLASMA

2015-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYSEN, CLAUDE

2015-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DENOYELLE, PASCAL

2015-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUERMOUD, HASSAN

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK