EP 1449128 A1 20040825 - COMPUTER-BASED TRANSACTION TAX PROCESSING SYSTEM, SERVICE MODULE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING TRANSACTION TAX SERVICES
Title (en)
COMPUTER-BASED TRANSACTION TAX PROCESSING SYSTEM, SERVICE MODULE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING TRANSACTION TAX SERVICES
Title (de)
COMPUTERGESTÜTZTES UMSATZSTEUER-VERARBEITUNGSYSTEM, WARTUNGSMODUL, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON UMSATZSTEUER-DIENSTEN
Title (fr)
SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DES TAXES SUR LES TRANSACTIONS, MODULE DE SERVICE, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE DE SERVICES ASSOCIES AUX TAXES SUR LES TRANSACTIONS
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 01990440 A 20011126
- EP 0113765 W 20011126
- EP 0113373 W 20011119
IPC 1-7
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 03044700A1
Citation (examination)
- KARP A.H.: "E-speak E-xplained", HP LABORATORIES TECHNICAL REPORT, 27 July 2000 (2000-07-27), pages 1 - 18
- DATABASE COMPENDEX July 2000 (2000-07-01), KARP ALAN H: "E-speak E-xplained", Database accession no. E2004448438076
- ANONYMOUS: "HP Labs 2000 Technical Report Abstracts", INTERNET CITATION, HP LABS, 3 August 2001 (2001-08-03), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20010803145029/http://www.hpl.hp.com/techreports/2000/> [retrieved on 20071130]
- KARP, ALAN: "Tech Report: HPL-2000-101: E-speak E-xplained:", INTERNET CITATION, HP LABS, 23 January 2001 (2001-01-23), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20010123042600/http://www.hpl.hp.com/techreports/2000/HPL-2000-101.html> [retrieved on 20071130]
- CHUN S, ATLURI V, ADAM N: "Dynamic Composition of Workflows for Customized eGovernment Service Delivery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL GOVERNMENT, (DG.O 2002), May 2002 (2002-05-01), Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.digitalgovernment.org/library/library/pdf/chun.pdf>
- SOON A.E. CHUN; ATLURI V.; ADAM N.R.: "Domain knowledge-based automatic workflow generation", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 2453, September 2002 (2002-09-01), pages 81 - 93, XP002338820
- KARP A.; KALOGERAKI V.: "The Client Utility as a peer-to-peer system", WEB ENGINEERING AND PEER-TO-PEER COMPUTING. NETWORKING 2002 WORKSHOPS. REVISED PAPERS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.2376), May 2002 (2002-05-01), pages 260 - 273
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01990440 A 20011126