Global Patent Index - EP 1449596 A1

EP 1449596 A1 20040825 - A method for processing a steel product, and product produced using said method

Title (en)

A method for processing a steel product, and product produced using said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bearbeitung eines Stahlproduktes und durch das Verfahren hergestelltes Produkt

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le traitement d'un produit en acier et produit fabriqué utilisant cette méthode

Publication

EP 1449596 A1 20040825 (EN)

Application

EP 03075546 A 20030224

Priority

EP 03075546 A 20030224

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for processing a steel product, in which the steel product is passed between a set of rotating rolls of a rolling mill stand in order to roll the steel product. According to the invention, the rolls of the rolling mill stand have different peripheral velocities such that one roll is a faster moving roll and the other roll is a slower moving roll, and the peripheral velocity of the faster moving roll is at least 5% higher and at most 100% higher than that of the slower moving roll, and the thickness of the steel product is reduced by at most 15% per pass, and the rolling takes place at a maximum temperature of 1350 DEG C. <??>The invention also relates to a steel product produced using the method, and to the use of this steel product.

IPC 1-7

B21B 1/02

IPC 8 full level

B21B 1/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 1/38 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01); C21D 8/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP KR US)

B21B 1/026 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21B 3/02 (2013.01 - KR); B21B 37/16 (2013.01 - KR); C21D 8/00 (2013.01 - KR); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01 - KR); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01 - KR); B21B 3/02 (2013.01 - EP US); B21B 2001/225 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21B 2001/383 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21B 2267/065 (2013.01 - EP KR US); B21B 2275/02 (2013.01 - KR); B21B 2275/05 (2013.01 - EP KR US); C21D 8/00 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 4086105 A 19780425 - MAYRHOFER MAX [AT], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 088 (M - 017) 24 June 1980 (1980-06-24)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 214 (C - 362) 25 July 1986 (1986-07-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 172 (M - 397) 17 July 1985 (1985-07-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 1449596 A1 20040825; AT 366149 T 20070715; AU 2004213135 A1 20040902; BR PI0407621 A 20060221; BR PI0407621 B1 20140617; CN 1767910 A 20060503; DE 602004007362 D1 20070816; EP 1599299 A1 20051130; EP 1599299 B1 20070704; JP 2006520692 A 20060914; KR 20050100701 A 20051019; MX PA05008979 A 20060427; PT 1599299 E 20070911; RU 2005129721 A 20060427; UA 85550 C2 20090210; US 2007051439 A1 20070308; WO 2004073900 A1 20040902; ZA 200506720 B 20061129

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 03075546 A 20030224; AT 04710868 T 20040213; AU 2004213135 A 20040213; BR PI0407621 A 20040213; CN 200480008619 A 20040213; DE 602004007362 T 20040213; EP 04710868 A 20040213; EP 2004001502 W 20040213; JP 2006501871 A 20040213; KR 20057015675 A 20050824; MX PA05008979 A 20040213; PT 04710868 T 20040213; RU 2005129721 A 20040213; UA 2005009038 A 20040213; US 54619204 A 20040213; ZA 200506720 A 20040213