Global Patent Index - EP 1449802 B1

EP 1449802 B1 2007-10-24 - Combination elevator doors

Title (en)

Combination elevator doors

Title (de)

Kombinierte Aufzugstüren

Title (fr)

Portes d'ascenseur combinées

Publication

EP 1449802 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04002978 A

Priority

  • EP 04002978 A
  • EP 03405118 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1449802A1] The present invention relates to sliding doors (10;12) used on landings and cars of elevator systems (1). In particular the invention provides door arrangements that permit greater versatility in the space utilization within a hoistway (2) of an elevator system (1). The landing and car (4) are provided with horizontally sliding doors (10;12) each formed from one or more panels (11;13) wherein the number of panels (11 ) in the landing door (10) is unequal to the number of panels (13) in the car door (12). Accordingly, the dimensions of the door-receiving spaces (B;A) for the landing door (10) and the car door (12) are unequal giving the installation designer greater flexibility to manipulate the layout of equipment within the hoistway (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/06 (2006.01); B66B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/30 (2013.01); B66B 13/06 (2013.01); B66B 19/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1449802 A1 20040825; EP 1449802 B1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100211

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20080723

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009624 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060622

2005-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050207

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK