Global Patent Index - EP 1449806 B1

EP 1449806 B1 2007-10-03 - Boom for a loader vehicle

Title (en)

Boom for a loader vehicle

Title (de)

Ausleger für ein Laderfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Flèche pour un véhicule chargeur

Publication

EP 1449806 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04100624 A

Priority

DE 10307689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1449806A1] Extension arm (14) for a loading vehicle, preferably a telescopic loader (10), comprises a support arrangement (16) having one end pivotably fixed on a frame (12) of the loading vehicle and a free end with a fixing flange (22), and a front part (18) receiving a tool and having a counter-flange (24) fixed to the first fixing flange. Preferred Features: The front part contains at least one cast part.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/065 (2006.01); B66C 23/687 (2006.01); E02F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/065 (2013.01); E02F 3/3402 (2013.01); E02F 3/3604 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1449806 A1 20040825; EP 1449806 B1 20071003; CA 2457972 A1 20040821; DE 10307689 A1 20040923; DE 502004005104 D1 20071115; ES 2291815 T3 20080301; US 2004165978 A1 20040826; US 7223061 B2 20070529

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2016-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160928

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150217

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005104

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2291815 T3

2007-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005104 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061013

2005-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK