Global Patent Index - EP 1449945 A3

EP 1449945 A3 2004-12-29 - Spin-drawtexturing- or drawtexturing machine

Title (en)

Spin-drawtexturing- or drawtexturing machine

Title (de)

Spinnstrecktexturier- oder Strecktexturiermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de filage-étirage texturation ou étirage texturation

Publication

EP 1449945 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04007528 A

Priority

  • CH 232297 A
  • EP 98810896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906975A1] The bundle of fibrils is transferred from one roller of the stretching roller pair (1a,b), to the texturing unit. They are led from this roller without deflection, directly up to and into the conveying section, which includes the conveying fluid distribution nozzles (13). An Independent claim is included for the texturing section of the machine, where the texturing nozzles (8) have a fan-shaped arrangement. Preferred features: Each individual texturing nozzle is aligned with its axis along the conveying direction of the bundle it propels. Each bundle leaves the delivery roller (1a) at a departure point (15), and runs literally straight, into its coaxial texturing nozzle (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/20; D02G 1/12; D02G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02G 1/12 (2006.01); D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02G 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/0266 (2013.01); D02G 1/12 (2013.01); D02G 1/16 (2013.01); D02G 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0906975 A1 19990407; EP 0906975 B1 20080312; BR 9803864 A 19991214; CH 692623 A5 20020830; CN 1095886 C 20021211; CN 1213717 A 19990414; DE 59814189 D1 20080424; EP 1449945 A2 20040825; EP 1449945 A3 20041229; EP 1449945 B1 20130529; TR 9801981 A2 19990421; TR 9801981 A3 19990421; US 6079086 A 20000627; US 6253430 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59814526

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140303

2013-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59814526

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

2013-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59814526

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2013-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59814526

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2013-07-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59814526

- Effective date: 20130725

2013-05-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0906975 P

2013-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2013-05-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG C/O SWISS TEX WINTERTH

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 1/16 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 1/02 20060101AFI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 1/12 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 1/20 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2012-10-10 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59814526

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: D02G0001200000

- IPC: D02G0001020000

2010-05-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100406

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050418

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-08-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0906975 P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT