Global Patent Index - EP 1450434 A8

EP 1450434 A8 2004-12-08 - Waveguide input apparatus of two orthogonally polarized waves including two probes attached to a common board

Title (en)

Waveguide input apparatus of two orthogonally polarized waves including two probes attached to a common board

Title (de)

Hohlleiter-Eingangsgerät für zwei orthogonal polarisierte Wellen mit zwei an einer gemeinsamen Leiterplatte verbundenen Sonden

Title (fr)

Appareil d'entrée de guide d'ondes pour deux ondes polarisées orthogonalement avec deux sondes connectées à une plaque commune

Publication

EP 1450434 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 04009075 A

Priority

  • EP 98300241 A
  • JP 481197 A
  • JP 23112797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853348A2] A waveguide input apparatus (1) of two orthogonally polarized waves includes a waveguide (la) having two cavities passing through the outer wall thereof to the interior, a first probe (5) provided protruding from an inner wall of the waveguide (1a) via a first cavity so that the leading end is parallel to a first plane of polarization (2), a second probe (7) provided protruding from the inner wall of the waveguide (la) via a second cavity so that the leading end is parallel to a second plane of polarization (3), and a circuit board (4) provided at the outer wall of the waveguide (la) so as to be parallel to the second plane of polarization (3), and having the first probe (5) and the second probe (7) connected thereto. A converter for satellite broadcasting receiver employing this apparatus is also provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/161

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/10 (2006.01); H01P 1/16 (2006.01); H01P 1/161 (2006.01); H01P 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/02 (2006.01); H01Q 13/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/247 (2013.01); H01P 1/16 (2013.01); H01P 1/161 (2013.01); H01Q 5/55 (2013.01); H01Q 13/0241 (2013.01); H01Q 13/0258 (2013.01); H01Q 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853348 A2 19980715; EP 0853348 A3 19981021; EP 0853348 B1 20040609; CN 1122324 C 20030924; CN 1193824 A 19980923; CN 1233063 C 20051221; CN 1484341 A 20040324; DE 69824322 D1 20040715; DE 69824322 T2 20050525; DE 69829894 D1 20050525; DE 69829894 T2 20060309; DE 69830626 D1 20050721; DE 69830626 T2 20060511; DE 69834146 D1 20060518; DE 69834146 T2 20070308; DE 69835467 D1 20060914; DE 69835467 T2 20070301; DE 69838963 D1 20080214; DE 69838963 T2 20081224; EP 1406341 A1 20040407; EP 1406341 B1 20050420; EP 1439598 A1 20040721; EP 1439598 B1 20060802; EP 1441410 A1 20040728; EP 1441410 B1 20060405; EP 1450434 A1 20040825; EP 1450434 A8 20041208; EP 1450434 B1 20050615; EP 1653551 A1 20060503; EP 1653551 B1 20080102; JP 3210889 B2 20010925; JP H10261902 A 19980929; TW 423178 B 20010221; US 6018276 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69830626

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69830626 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0853348 P

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIROTA, MAKOTO

2004-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAGANO, ATSUSHI

2004-08-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0853348 P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT