Global Patent Index - EP 1451619 A4

EP 1451619 A4 2007-10-03 - STRUCTURES AND METHODS FOR REDUCING ABERRATION IN OPTICAL SYSTEMS

Title (en)

STRUCTURES AND METHODS FOR REDUCING ABERRATION IN OPTICAL SYSTEMS

Title (de)

STRUKTUREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER ABERRATION IN OPTISCHEN SYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES ET PROCEDES DE REDUCTION D'ABERRATION DANS DES SYSTEMES OPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1451619 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02795578 A

Priority

  • US 0234828 W
  • US 33509301 P
  • US 33218301 P
  • US 36380802 P
  • US 36791102 P
  • US 38542702 P
  • US 17860102 A
  • US 17893702 A
  • US 17862102 A
  • US 17893502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03038479A2] An optical system includes multiple cubic crystalline optical elements and one or more polarization rotators in which the crystal lattices of the cubic crystalline optical elements are oriented with respect to each other to reduce the effects of intrinsic birefringence and produce a system with reduced retardance. The optical system may be a refractive or catadioptric system having a high numerical aperture and using light with a wavelength at or below 248 nanometers. The net retardance of the system is less than the sum of the retardance contributions of the respective optical elements. In one embodiment, all cubic crystalline optical elements are oriented with identical three dimensional cubic crystalline lattice directions, a 90 DEG polarization rotator divides the system into front and rear groups such that the net retardance of the front group is balanced by the net retardance of the rear group. The optical system may be used in a photolithography tool to pattern substrates such as semiconductor substrates and thereby produce semiconductor devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 13/24; G02B 27/00; G02B 5/00; G03F 7/20; G02B 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 13/24 (2006.01); G02B 1/02 (2006.01); G02B 27/28 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/70075 (2013.01); G02B 27/28 (2013.01); G03F 7/70216 (2013.01); G03F 7/70966 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 6137626 A 20001024 - TAKAOKA HIDEYUKI [JP]
  • [X] US 4918395 A 19900417 - DIFONZO JOHN C [US], et al
  • [X] US 3052152 A 19620904 - KOESTER CHARLES J
  • [A] BURNETT J H ET AL: "Intrinsic Birefringence in 157nm Materials", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON 157NM LITHOGRAPHY, DANA POINT , CALIFORNIA, 15 May 2001 (2001-05-15), pages 1 - 13, XP002218849
  • See also references of WO 03038479A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03038479 A2 20030508; WO 03038479 A3 20040129; AU 2002360329 A1 20030512; EP 1451619 A2 20040901; EP 1451619 A4 20071003; JP 2005508018 A 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091229

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090818

2007-10-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070904

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 13/24 20060101AFI20070612BHEP

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 27/00 20060101ALI20070612BHEP

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 5/00 20060101ALI20070612BHEP

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03F 7/20 20060101ALI20070612BHEP

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G02B 5/30 20060101ALI20070612BHEP

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASML NETHERLANDS B.V.

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI