Global Patent Index - EP 1451793 A4

EP 1451793 A4 2007-10-24 - DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 1451793 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02802687 A

Priority

  • IB 0204666 W
  • ZA 200109215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03041037A1] The invention discloses a display device including an elongated pole member having a base end, adapted to be supported relative to a surface, and a distal end. The pole member, at or near its distal end, supports an elongated resilient member. The pole member and resilient member fixedly and removably support a flexible sheet. The sheet is at least partially tensioned by the resilient member relative to the pole member. The pole member can be provided in sections with a tension cable extending through each of the sections for allowing dismantling and erecting of the pole member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 17/00 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0025 (2013.01); G09F 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 03041037A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03041037 A1 20030515; AU 2002363485 B2 20050901; EP 1451793 A1 20040901; EP 1451793 A4 20071024; ZA 200404505 B 20050525

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081111

2007-10-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 17/00 20060101AFI20030520BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 15/00 20060101ALI20070914BHEP

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOWHEAD INTERNATIONAL (PTY) LTD

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI