EP 1452242 A3 20060118 - Patterned release finish
Title (en)
Patterned release finish
Title (de)
Gemusterte Antihaft-Beschichtung
Title (fr)
Revêtement antiadhésif à motifs décoratifs
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 98948081 A 19980903
- US 5814897 P 19970908
- US 14476698 A 19980901
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1452242A2] Smooth, patterned substrates useful in producing decorative cookware are formed by coating a base with a mixture of fluoropolymer and magnetic flakes and magnetically inducing an image in the polymer coating composition. The baked fluoropolymer release coating contains magnetizable flakes, a portion of the flakes being oriented in the plane of the substrate and a portions of said flakes being magnetically reoriented to form a pattern in the coating which is observed in reflected light, the flakes having a longest dimension which is greater than the thickness of said coating. The patterned substrate is formed by applying magnetic force through the edges of a magnetizable die positioned under a coated base to induce an imaging effect or pattern. The coating composition in then cured resulting in a smooth surface, patterned nonstick finish on the substrate.
IPC 8 full level
B05D 3/14 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B05D 5/08 (2006.01); B32B 5/14 (2006.01); B32B 15/08 (2006.01); B32B 27/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B05D 3/207 (2013.01); B05D 5/06 (2013.01); B05D 5/083 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] EP 0556449 A1 19930825 - HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]
- [DA] GB 1131038 A 19681016 - TEFAL SA
- [A] EP 0406667 A1 19910109 - NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]
- [A] US 4518626 A 19850521 - KATO MIKIHIKO [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 11 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 450 (C - 547) 25 November 1988 (1988-11-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 073 (C - 101) 8 May 1982 (1982-05-08)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 291 (C - 1067) 4 June 1993 (1993-06-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04012916 A 19980903