Global Patent Index - EP 1452629 A3

EP 1452629 A3 2004-12-29 - Production method for a filament yarn and corresponding device

Title (en)

Production method for a filament yarn and corresponding device

Title (de)

Herstellverfahren für ein Filamentgarn sowie entsprechende Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un filament continu et dispositif correspondant

Publication

EP 1452629 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04013064 A

Priority

  • DE 10138249 A
  • EP 02737726 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03012180A1] The invention relates to a device for producing one or more fibrils or filament yarns (10), whereby first capillaries (25a) are placed in the center of a spinning unit, for guiding flows of a first material (10a), and whereby additional capillaries (25c) provided for at least one additional material (10b) are placed in the vicinity of the first capillaries (25a), whereby all capillaries communicate with a spinning capillary (32). The invention is characterized in that the first capillaries (25a) are placed in the center of a spinning unit so that the flows of a first material (10a) unite to form a continuous core consisting of a filament core (10'a) and of at least one filament wing (10''a) joined thereto, and that additional capillaries (25c) for another materiel (10b) are placed in the vicinity of the first capillaries (25a) so that the additional material (10b) rests upon the core whereby at least partially enclosing it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/30; D01D 5/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/30 (2006.01); D01D 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/30 (2013.01); D01D 5/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03012180 A1 20030213; CN 1564884 A 20050112; CN 1629369 A 20050622; DE 10138249 A1 20030213; EP 1415024 A1 20040506; EP 1452629 A2 20040901; EP 1452629 A3 20041229; US 2007178182 A1 20070802

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070226

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT TR

2005-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050628

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REBSAMEN, ARTHUR

2004-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1415024 P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK