Global Patent Index - EP 1452632 B1

EP 1452632 B1 2009-02-04 - Four-for one twister

Title (en)

Four-for one twister

Title (de)

Vierfach-Zwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Broche quadruple torsion

Publication

EP 1452632 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04008829 A

Priority

  • EP 97122447 A
  • JP 3896297 A
  • JP 4071997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863234A2] A four-for-one twister that enables yarn to pass through easily and quickly, increasing operating efficiency. In four-for-one twister 21 which twists yarn by means of upper disk 23 in which yarn guide hole 47a is formed and lower disk 24 in which yarn guide hole 47b is formed rotating in the same plane in mutually opposed directions, air for passing the yarn is flowed through both yarn guide holes 47a and 47b in a forwardly moving direction. Yarn guide holes 47a and 47b are formed so as to be connected. Ejection nozzle 48 which injects air to pass the yarn opens into yarn guide hole 47 in a suitable place. Inner guiding member 39 which revolves around the outside of supply package P on upper disk 23 is provided, and yarn guide pipe 53 is provided in inner guiding member 39 connected to yarn guide hole 47a on upper disk 23.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/88 (2006.01); D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/868 (2013.01); D01H 1/105 (2013.01); D01H 7/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863234 A2 19980909; EP 0863234 A3 20000809; EP 0863234 B1 20040428; DE 69728855 D1 20040603; DE 69728855 T2 20050203; DE 69739244 D1 20090319; EP 1452632 A2 20040901; EP 1452632 A3 20041117; EP 1452632 B1 20090204

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69739244 P 20090319

2009-02-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0863234 P

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2004-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0863234 P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT