EP 1453347 A1 20040901 - Loudspeaker system
Title (en)
Loudspeaker system
Title (de)
Lautsprechersystem
Title (fr)
Système de haut-parleur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03290457 A 20030227
Abstract (en)
The loudspeaker system has a housing (1), a loudspeaker (3) in a first opening (2) in the housing and a second opening (6) that communicates with the rear of the loudspeaker via a twisted path along an axis (A). The second opening is arranged on an extension of the axis. The twisted path is formed with a pipe (8) and a number of radial walls (10) in the pipe.
Abstract (de)
In einer ersten Öffnung (2, 4) eines Lautsprechergehäuses (1) ist ein Lautsprecher (3, 5) eingefügt. Eine zweite Öffnung (6) des Gehäuses (1) kommuniziert mit einer Rückseite des Lautsprechers (3, 5) über einen entlang einer Achse (A) gewendelten Gang und ist in Verlängerung der Achse (A) angeordnet. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H04R 1/28 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04R 1/2826 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4933982 A 19900612 - TANAKA TOSHIHIKO [JP]
- [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 09 31 July 1998 (1998-07-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 05 12 May 2003 (2003-05-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 06 22 September 2000 (2000-09-22)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03290457 A 20030227