Global Patent Index - EP 1454747 A3

EP 1454747 A3 2007-10-10 - Device for monitoring safety-relevant processes in machines

Title (en)

Device for monitoring safety-relevant processes in machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von sicherheitsrelevanten Vorgängen an Maschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la surveillance des processus importants pour la sécurité dans des machines

Publication

EP 1454747 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04102212 A

Priority

  • DE 19908230 A
  • EP 99103804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031420A1] The device has at least one field bus system (2) that connects an operating controller (1), a safety-relevant input/output device (4) and at least one safety monitoring controller (6). The safety input/output device and/or safety monitoring controller is/are mounted on the control/drive elements (9,10) performing the safety-relevant functions in a distributed manner. Independent claim is also included for a method of monitoring safety-relevant processes in drive/control arrangement in machines.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0009 (2013.01); B41F 33/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031420 A1 20000830; EP 1031420 B1 20040811; DE 19908230 A1 20000831; EP 1454747 A2 20040908; EP 1454747 A3 20071010; EP 1454747 B1 20140402; JP 2000246878 A 20000912; JP 5052710 B2 20121017; US 6832121 B1 20041214

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-04-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915404

- Effective date: 20150106

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140402

2015-03-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150106

2015-01-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915404

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-08-20 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915404

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2014-04-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1031420 P

2014-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2014-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-09-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130819

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRITSCHOW, MICHAEL

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANZER, REINHARD

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALBRECHT, KAI

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROESSLER, GEORG

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRIMM, ULRICH

2013-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, ANDREAS

2013-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130417

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2008-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080206

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-09-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1031420 P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL