Global Patent Index - EP 1455477 A8

EP 1455477 A8 2004-12-29 - Electronic apparatus with communication device

Title (en)

Electronic apparatus with communication device

Title (de)

Elektronisches Gerät mit Verbindungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil électronique avec dispositif de communication

Publication

EP 1455477 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 04004999 A

Priority

JP 2003057368 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1455477A2] An electronic apparatus includes a communication device (107) that executes communication with an external device (20), an input device (13, 15), a unit that selects one of a first communication mode and a second communication mode in accordance with an operation of the input device (13, 15), and a unit for, when the first communication mode is selected, controlling one-way communication to transmit content data from the communication device (107) to the external device (20) with a first quality and for, when the second communication mode is selected, controlling two-way communication to transmit and receive content data between the communication device (107) and the external device (20) with a second quality which is lower than the first quality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 7/30 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2015.01); H04L 5/14 (2006.01); H04L 5/16 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04M 1/60 (2006.01); H04R 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 5/14 (2013.01); H04L 5/16 (2013.01); H04M 1/6066 (2013.01); H04R 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1455477 A2 20040908; EP 1455477 A3 20070117; EP 1455477 A8 20041229; JP 2004266748 A 20040924; JP 3725880 B2 20051214; US 2004215808 A1 20041028

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100811

2007-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2007-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/08 20060101AFI20061212BHEP

2004-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOMMA, TORU,C/O TOSHIBA CORPORATION,

2004-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOMMA, TORU,C/O TOSHIBA CORPORATION

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK