Global Patent Index - EP 1457104 B9

EP 1457104 B9 2007-10-10 - Electric drive riding greens mower

Title (en)

Electric drive riding greens mower

Title (de)

Elektrisch-selbstfahrender Rasenmäher

Title (fr)

Tondeuse à gazon à moteur électrique d'entrainement équipée d'un siège

Publication

EP 1457104 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 04010869 A

Priority

  • EP 95909346 A
  • US 19151894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5402110A] A system such as one for detecting when a hydraulic fluid system adapted to a turf care machine, has developed a leak and to warn the machine operator of such a leak before an appreciable amount of hydraulic fluid is allowed to leak from the system. The system includes a reservoir for holding a quantity of hydraulic fluid. The reservoir is connected via a connecting tube or hose to an expansion tank mounted adjacent to the reservoir. The expansion tank includes a fitting having an elongated tube extending down into the expansion tank. The end of this tube is maintained substantially below the level of hydraulic fluid in the expansion tank during operation of the turf care machine to which it is attached. As the machine is operated, the hydraulic fluid expands with rising temperature, and the connecting tube communicates the expanding fluid to the expansion tank. When operation of the machine is discontinued the hydraulic fluid contracts as it cools. As the hydraulic fluid contracts, the hydraulic fluid in the expansion tank, is automatically drawn by a siphoning action through the elongated tube within the expansion tank through the connecting tube and back into the reservoir. A float type fluid level sensor is provided and mounted to measure the level of hydraulic fluid within the expansion tank. The float level sensor sends an electronic signal corresponding to the fluid level in the expansion tank to a microcomputer based monitoring unit. The monitoring unit also senses the fluid temperature and interprets these electronic signals and, compensating for volumetric fluctuations due to the changing fluid temperature, and determines if conditions exist which indicate a hydraulic fluid leak exists. If such conditions exist, the monitoring unit produces a warning signal which is communicated to the vehicle operator.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/58 (2006.01); A01D 34/44 (2006.01); A01D 67/04 (2006.01); A01D 69/02 (2006.01); A01D 75/30 (2006.01); G01F 23/72 (2006.01); G01F 23/74 (2006.01); G01F 25/00 (2006.01); G01M 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01M 3/3245 (2013.01); A01D 69/03 (2013.01); G01F 23/72 (2013.01); G01F 23/74 (2013.01); G01F 25/0061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5402110 A 19950328; DE 69533307 D1 20040902; DE 69533307 T2 20041230; DE 69535364 D1 20070215; DE 69535364 T2 20070823; DE 69536107 D1 20101028; EP 1457104 A2 20040915; EP 1457104 A3 20041027; EP 1457104 B1 20070103; EP 1457104 B9 20071010; EP 1790205 A2 20070530; EP 1790205 A3 20080312; EP 1790205 B1 20100915; US 5548278 A 19960820

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-02-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150131

2015-02-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69535364

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69535364 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0741510 P

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050427

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01D 34/58 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01D 67/04 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01D 75/30 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01D 69/02 B

2004-09-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0741510 P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB