Global Patent Index - EP 1457941 A3

EP 1457941 A3 2004-12-15 - Safekeeping device for credit card and similar cards of the same shape

Title (en)

Safekeeping device for credit card and similar cards of the same shape

Title (de)

Sicherungsvorrichtung für Kreditkarten und ähnliche Karten

Title (fr)

Système de sécurisation de cartes de crédit et similaires

Publication

EP 1457941 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 04004128 A

Priority

  • IT MI20030355 A
  • IT MI20031865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1457941A2] It is disclosed a safekeeping device for credit cards and similar cards of the same shape comprising a container (2) adapted to house at least one credit card (3) or similar card, sensing means (5) associated with the container (2) and adapted to detect at least one predetermined condition correlated with a subsequent possibility of losing and/or damaging the card, signalling means (6), and a control unit (7) designed to receive input signals from the sensing means (5) and to emit output signals to operate the signalling means (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/14; G08B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2006.01); G08B 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/182 (2013.01); G08B 13/149 (2013.01); G08B 21/023 (2013.01); G08B 21/025 (2013.01); G08B 21/0252 (2013.01); G08B 21/0255 (2013.01); G08B 21/24 (2013.01); A45C 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1457941 A2 20040915; EP 1457941 A3 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090319

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK