Global Patent Index - EP 1458176 A8

EP 1458176 A8 2004-12-29 - Image forming apparatus and function key assignment method

Title (en)

Image forming apparatus and function key assignment method

Title (de)

Bilderzeugungsgerät und Funktionstastenzuordnungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil de formation d'images et procédé d'attribution de touches de fonction

Publication

EP 1458176 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 04251441 A

Priority

  • JP 2003068147 A
  • JP 2004067472 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1458176A1] An image forming apparatus that can include a plurality of applications is provided, in which the image forming apparatus includes: a displaying part displaying a screen used for selecting an application on an operation display part of the image forming apparatus; and an assigning part assigning a selected application that is selected on the screen to a function key when the function key is pushed for the selected application; wherein the function key is a key used for a user to select and execute an application from a plurality of applications. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/00; G03G 15/00; G06F 3/023

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/38 (2006.01); B41J 29/00 (2006.01); B41J 29/42 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/02 (2006.01); G06F 3/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/00352 (2013.01); G03G 15/502 (2013.01); G03G 15/5087 (2013.01); H04N 1/00387 (2013.01); H04N 1/00411 (2013.01); H04N 1/00477 (2013.01); H04N 1/0048 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00109 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1458176 A1 20040915; EP 1458176 A8 20041229; EP 1458176 B1 20120502; CN 100361487 C 20080109; CN 1570778 A 20050126; JP 2004297792 A 20041021; US 2004239973 A1 20041202

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-05-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602004037581

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120502

2012-08-22 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20120502

2012-06-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602004037581

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2012-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070709

2005-06-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICOH COMPANY, LTD.

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK