EP 1464960 A1 20041006 - Screening Method for the Identification of new Proteome-Interacting Compounds
Title (en)
Screening Method for the Identification of new Proteome-Interacting Compounds
Title (de)
Screeningverfahren zur Identifizierung neuer Proteom-interagierender Verbindungen
Title (fr)
Procédé de criblage pour l'identification de nouveaux composés interagissant avec un proteome
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03007690 A 20030403
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to the search for new drugs and in particular to a method for screening a library of potentially proteome-interacting candidate compounds for identifying a protein/protein-complex interacting compound and thereby further identifying a proteome-interacting compound. Furthermore, new and yet unidentified interactions between the proteome and compounds can be identified using the method according to the present invention.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C40B 30/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C40B 30/04 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] GOURI B S ET AL: "Interaction of SH3 domain of Hck tyrosine kinase with cellular proteins containing proline-rich regions: evidence for modulation by unique domain.", INDIAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY & BIOPHYSICS. INDIA 1997 FEB-APR, vol. 34, no. 1-2, February 1997 (1997-02-01), pages 29 - 39, XP009017954, ISSN: 0301-1208
- [X] ZHU H ET AL: "Global analysis of protein activities using proteome chips", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 293, no. 5537, 14 September 2001 (2001-09-14), pages 2101 - 2105, XP002201608, ISSN: 0036-8075
- [X] SHEVCHENKO ANNA ET AL: "Deciphering protein complexes and protein interaction networks by tandem affinity purification and mass spectrometry: Analytical perspective.", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, vol. 1, no. 3, March 2002 (2002-03-01), March, 2002, pages 204 - 212, XP002255660, ISSN: 1535-9476
- [DA] GAVIN A-C ET AL: "Functional organization of the yeast proteome by systematic analysis of protein complexes", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, vol. 415, January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 141 - 147, XP002958851, ISSN: 0028-0836
- [A] KUKAR THOMAS ET AL: "Protein microarrays to detect protein-protein interactions using red and green fluorescent proteins.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 306, no. 1, 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01), July 1, 2002, pages 50 - 54, XP002255661, ISSN: 0003-2697
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03007690 A 20030403