Global Patent Index - EP 1466670 B1

EP 1466670 B1 2009-02-18 - Device for cleaning a powder coating booth and powder coating booth with a cleaning device

Title (en)

Device for cleaning a powder coating booth and powder coating booth with a cleaning device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Reinigung einer Pulverbeschichtungskabine und Pulverbeschichtungskabine mit Reinigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage de cabine de revêtement par poudrage et cabine de revêtement par poudrage munie d'un dispositif de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1466670 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04405132 A

Priority

DE 20305947 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1466670A2] A system for cleaning a powder coating cabin (1) comprises air blast strips (9, 13) for the cabin floor (4) and a cabin wall (3), and a suction channel (7) with a suction slit (7.1). The purpose of the air blast channels is to drive surplus powder in the direction of the suction slit. An independent claim is also included for a powder coating cabin incorporating the inventive cleaning system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 14/41 (2018.02); B05B 14/48 (2018.02); Y10S 118/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20305947 U1 20030618; DE 502004008996 D1 20090402; EP 1466670 A2 20041013; EP 1466670 A3 20070328; EP 1466670 B1 20090218; EP 1935504 A2 20080625; EP 1935504 A3 20090325; US 2005000419 A1 20050106; US 6997991 B2 20060214

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502004008996

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B05B0015120000

- IPC: B05B0016000000

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-09-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-05-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GEMA SWITZERLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-12-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ITW GEMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008996 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080225

2007-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK