EP 1466853 A1 20041013 - Method for the maintenance of an elevator
Title (en)
Method for the maintenance of an elevator
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Wartung eines Aufzuges
Title (fr)
Méthode pour l' entretien d'un ascenseur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03405232 A 20030407
Abstract (en)
The elevator cage (5) may be stopped in various maintenance positions (W1-W3) between floors to allow personnel (6) access to equipment (4) and has stops (8,9) to prevent unwanted movement of the cage. Doors (T1-T4) on each floor (E1-E4) may be locked shut or may be opened as required to allow personnel to step onto the roof (7) of the elevator cage.
Abstract (de)
Bei diesem Verfahren fährt die Aufzugskabine (5) im Wartungsbetriebsmodus automatisch gesteuert nacheinander in mehrere Wartungspositionen (W1,W2,W3,W4) wobei während des Haltes an den Wartungspositionen (W1,W2,W3) die Wartung durchgeführt wird. Die Wartungspositionen sind durch die Wartungspersonen frei bestimmbar. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B66B 5/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B66B 5/005 (2013.01); B66B 5/0087 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] NL 9100059 A 19920803 - OTIS LIFTEN B V
- [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 294 (M - 1616) 6 June 1994 (1994-06-06)
- [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 536 (M - 1052) 27 November 1990 (1990-11-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 15 6 April 2001 (2001-04-06)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03405232 A 20030407