Global Patent Index - EP 1466858 A3

EP 1466858 A3 2004-12-08 - Industrial truck for high rise shelves with a driving unit

Title (en)

Industrial truck for high rise shelves with a driving unit

Title (de)

Hochregalflurförderzeug mit einer Antriebseinheit

Title (fr)

Chariot de manutention pour rayonnages hauts avec une unité d'entraînement

Publication

EP 1466858 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04007694 A

Priority

DE 10316051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1466858A2] The high shelf loading machine has a frame with two side plates (1) and a cross-member (2) holding a motor support plate (3). An electric drive motor (5) is connected to a steerable drive wheel (7). A steering motor (8) has a small pinion in mesh with a large pinion to swivel the driving wheel on a vertical axis. An electric motor (11) drives a hydraulic pump (10), mounted on the frame plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/07572 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5215166 A 19930601 - PIPES GEORGE [US]
  • [A] EP 0586796 A1 19940316 - DAIFUKU KK [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 06 4 June 2002 (2002-06-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 460 (M - 1032) 4 October 1990 (1990-10-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1466858 A2 20041013; EP 1466858 A3 20041208; EP 1466858 B1 20060920; DE 10316051 A1 20041021; DE 502004001508 D1 20061102

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004001508

- Representative's name: PATENTSHIP PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004001508

- Representative's name: PATENTSHIP PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004001508

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KION WAREHOUSE SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STILL WAGNER GMBH, 72766 REUTLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502004001508

- Effective date: 20110405

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2008-11-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-03-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STILL WAGNER GMBH

2007-08-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BT PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-05-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061220

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004001508 P 20061102

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2006-09-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK