Global Patent Index - EP 1467040 A8

EP 1467040 A8 2004-12-22 - Cladding with a fixing device

Title (en)

Cladding with a fixing device

Title (de)

Verkleidung mit einer Einrichtung zu deren Befestigung

Title (fr)

Revêtement avec un élément de fixation

Publication

EP 1467040 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 04008384 A

Priority

DE 10316260 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1467040A2] Covering (21) with a fixing device comprises an edge region (33) with two opposite-lying guides (35) or hook devices that are arranged nearby each other. An independent claim is also included for an arrangement consisting of at least two coverings (21, 22) and a clip (23). Preferred Features: One of the guides or hook devices has a groove running parallel to the edge region. One of the guides or hook devices has a recess running perpendicularly to the edge region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/28; E04B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/00 (2006.01); E04B 9/04 (2006.01); E04B 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/061 (2013.01); E04B 9/003 (2013.01); E04B 9/0428 (2013.01); E04B 9/28 (2013.01); E04B 2009/0492 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1467040 A2 20041013; EP 1467040 A3 20060607; EP 1467040 A8 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100609

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061207

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2006-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 9/04 20060101AFI20060411BHEP

2006-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 9/00 20060101ALI20060411BHEP

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKD GEBR. KUFFERATH AG

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAMMERS, MICHAEL

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK