Global Patent Index - EP 1469234 B8

EP 1469234 B8 2007-10-17 - Method for forming a gearbox casing for a plurality of engines for motor vehicles, and forming mould for producing the casing

Title (en)

Method for forming a gearbox casing for a plurality of engines for motor vehicles, and forming mould for producing the casing

Title (de)

Methode zur formenden Herstellung eines Getriebegehäuses für eine Vielzahl von Motoren und Gussform zur Herstellung des Gehäuses

Title (fr)

Procédé pour moulage d'un carter de boîte de vitesse pour differents moteurs à combustion interne et moule pour fabriquer le carter

Publication

EP 1469234 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04101503 A

Priority

IT TO20030290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1469234A1] Method for forming a gearbox casing (1) for a plurality of engines for motor vehicles; the casing has a housing portion (2) for accommodating the gearbox, and an attachment portion (3) for connecting the housing portion (2) to one of the engines; according to the method, the characteristics of each engine are identified, and the housing portion (2) is made in common for all the engines, while for making the attachment portion (3) a mould (5) is provided, comprising an interchangeable insert (11) made according to the specific identified characteristics of the engine to which the casing (1) is to be connected. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 25/02 (2006.01); B60K 17/02 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F16H 57/025 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 57/025 (2013.01); B22D 25/02 (2013.01); F02F 7/0073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1469234 A1 20041020; EP 1469234 B1 20070912; EP 1469234 B8 20071017; DE 602004008822 D1 20071025; DE 602004008822 T2 20080619; ES 2290624 T3 20080216; IT TO20030290 A1 20041015

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130414

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120414

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, FIAT AUTO S.P.A., , IT

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FIAT AUTO S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, FIAT AUTO S.P.A., , IT

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FIAT AUTO S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, MICH., US; FIAT AUTO S.P.A., TURIN/TORINO, IT

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, MICH., US; FIAT AUTO S.P.A., TURIN/TORINO, IT

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004008822

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290624 T3

2007-12-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004008822 P 20071025

2007-10-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FIAT AUTO S.P.A.

2007-10-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC.

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-07-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2005-06-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050418

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK