EP 1469324 A1 20041020 - An illumination device formed by cutting and laminating coated plates
Title (en)
An illumination device formed by cutting and laminating coated plates
Title (de)
Ein Beleuchtungsgerät aus beschichteten Platten, die geschnitten und laminiert wurden
Title (fr)
Appareil d'éclairage formé par découpage et lamination de plaques recouvertes par des couches minces
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03076129 A 20030416
Abstract (en)
An illumination device includes a composite body (26) produced from the lamination of a number of plastic plates (2) bonded together at interfaces that are provided with light-reflective selective coatings (10), the laminate being machined across preselected planes (20) to provide the desired angular orientation, whereby light entering the illumination device is deflected along parallel emergent paths. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G02B 5/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G02B 5/045 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5221982 A 19930622 - FARIS SADEG M [US]
- [X] EP 1256822 A2 20021113 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 04 4 August 2002 (2002-08-04)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 06 4 June 2002 (2002-06-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03076129 A 20030416