Global Patent Index - EP 1473749 A3

EP 1473749 A3 2004-12-01 - Control device with hysteresis

Title (en)

Control device with hysteresis

Title (de)

Steuerung mit Hystereseschleife

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à hystérésis

Publication

EP 1473749 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 04300197 A

Priority

FR 0305283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1473749A2] The device has a control electromagnet provided with a movable pallet between a resting position and a working position under action of a coil (20). A slide coupled with the pallet operates an auxiliary contact (10) to provide a hysteresis function such that open and closed states of the contact obtained at end of course brings the pallet into working and resting positions, respectively. An independent claim is also included for an electrical interrupter with a control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/06; H01H 47/08; H01H 47/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/10 (2006.01); H01H 47/06 (2006.01); H01H 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/10 (2013.01); H01H 47/06 (2013.01); H01H 47/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1473749 A2 20041103; EP 1473749 A3 20041201; EP 1473749 B1 20071114; CN 100343935 C 20071017; CN 1542884 A 20041103; DE 602004009985 D1 20071227; DE 602004009985 T2 20080313; ES 2294450 T3 20080401; FR 2854492 A1 20041105; FR 2854492 B1 20081017

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294450 T3

2008-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080225

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009985 P 20071227

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK