Global Patent Index - EP 1473772 A8

EP 1473772 A8 2004-12-22 - A color OLED display with improved power efficiency

Title (en)

A color OLED display with improved power efficiency

Title (de)

Farbige OLED-Anzeigevorrichtung mit verbessertem Leistungswirkungsgrad

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage couleur à diodes électroluminescentes organiques à efficacité de puissance améliorée

Publication

EP 1473772 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 04076186 A

Priority

US 42629903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1473772A2] A color OLED display includes an array of light emitting OLED pixels (10), each pixel having three or more gamut elements (12,14,16) for emitting different colors of light specifying a gamut and at least one additional element (18) for emitting a color of light within the gamut and wherein the power efficiency of the additional element is higher than the power efficiency of at least one of the three or more gamut elements; wherein all of the gamut elements for each color in the display are arranged in a first direction in a line such that no differently colored gamut element is in the line; wherein the colored gamut elements are arranged in a second direction orthogonal to the first direction in a line such that the colors of the gamut elements alternate in that line; and wherein the additional elements are arranged in lines in both the first and second directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/12 (2006.01); G09G 3/32 (2006.01); H01L 27/32 (2006.01); H01L 51/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3216 (2013.01); G09G 3/3225 (2013.01); H01L 27/3213 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0452 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0809 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0842 (2013.01); H01L 27/3216 (2013.01); H01L 27/3218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1473772 A2 20041103; EP 1473772 A3 20090506; EP 1473772 A8 20041222; EP 1473772 B1 20160831; CN 100438117 C 20081126; CN 1551383 A 20041201; JP 2004335467 A 20041125; JP 4723203 B2 20110713; KR 101134410 B1 20120409; KR 20040094335 A 20041109; TW 200505260 A 20050201; TW I347144 B 20110811; US 2004217694 A1 20041104; US 6919681 B2 20050719

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-06-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602004049855

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602004049855

2016-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2016-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-04-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160315

2016-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 27/32 20060101AFI20160229BHEP

2016-02-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602004049855

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01L0027000000

- IPC: H01L0027320000

2011-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GLOBAL OLED TECHNOLOGY LLC

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GLOBAL OLED TECHNOLOGY LLC

2010-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091110

2009-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091007

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COK, RONALD S.,C/O EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, ANDREW D.,C/O EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-12-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINTERS, DUSTIN L.,C/O EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A COLOR OLED DISPLAY WITH IMPROVED POWER EFFICIENCY

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-11-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK