Global Patent Index - EP 1475699 B8

EP 1475699 B8 2009-02-18 - Multiplier

Title (en)

Multiplier

Title (de)

Multiplizierer

Title (fr)

Multiplieur

Publication

EP 1475699 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04018295 A

Priority

  • EP 94113808 A
  • JP 21878093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0642093A2] With respect to each bit of a multiplier factor, it is judged whether or not the multiplicand is a variable or a constant. If the multiplier factor is a constant, it is judged whether or not a bit of concern in the multiplier factor has the value of 1. Only if the bit of concern in the multiplier factor is 1, there is generated a circuit for outputting, as a partial product, a signal indicating a multiplicand. The signal indicating the multiplicand is then shifted by one bit so that the resulting signal is newly set as the signal indicating the multiplicand. By repeatedly executing the foregoing process with respect to all the bits of the multiplier factor, a circuit for calculating a partial product with respect to each bit of the multiplier factor is generated. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/52 (2006.01); G06F 7/533 (2006.01); G06F 7/508 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01); G06F 7/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/53 (2013.01); G06F 7/52 (2013.01); G06F 7/533 (2013.01); G06F 17/5045 (2013.01); G06F 7/4824 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0642093 A2 19950308; EP 0642093 A3 19960313; EP 0642093 B1 20060802; CN 1102260 C 20030226; CN 1106941 A 19950816; DE 69434806 D1 20060914; DE 69434806 T2 20061221; DE 69435167 D1 20081224; DE 69435179 D1 20090212; EP 1475699 A2 20041110; EP 1475699 A3 20041117; EP 1475699 B1 20081112; EP 1475699 B8 20090218; EP 1752870 A2 20070214; EP 1752870 A3 20070516; EP 1752870 B1 20081231; JP 2972498 B2 19991108; JP H0773227 A 19950317; KR 0126626 B1 19980404; TW 401557 B 20000811; US 5600569 A 19970204

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69435167

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORP.

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090912

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20091221

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-01-05 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69435167 P 20081224

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-11-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0642093 P

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIYAMA, TAMOTSU

2005-01-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TSUBATA, SHINTARO

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-11-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0642093 P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL