Global Patent Index - EP 1478001 B8

EP 1478001 B8 2009-02-18 - NAVIGATION SWITCH DEVICE

Title (en)

NAVIGATION SWITCH DEVICE

Title (de)

NAVIGATIONSUMSCHALTEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION DE MODES DE NAVIGATION

Publication

EP 1478001 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 03739655 A

Priority

  • JP 0301438 W
  • JP 2002040214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1478001A1] The present invention provides a navigation switch apparatus with simple construction capable of operating in eight directions in total including longitudinal, lateral and diagonal directions. The navigation switch apparatus has a printed circuit board (1) provided thereon four conductors (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) shaped a circle with small spaces (3a, 3b, 3c, 3d) between each pair of four conductors so that whole the conductors are shaped a doughnut-like. Further, a cap-shaped body (5) arranged opposite to the printed circuit board (1) is provided with short-circuiters (6a, 6b, 6c, 6d) capable of making contact with the respective four conductors (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) when a navigation lever (11) is operated in the longitudinal, lateral and diagonal directions. Each conductor is formed with two opposed comb-shaped conductive layers (4a, 4b) such that the central portion of the one conductive layer is in a diametrically directed comparatively-coarse comb shape, whereas both the end portions of the other conductive layer are in a circumferentially directed comparatively-fine comb shape, and the cap-shaped body (5) has a thin-walled portion on its outer periphery. Thick-walled portions (8a, 8b, 8c, 8d, 8e, 8f, 8g, 8h) extending in the longitudinal, lateral and diagonal directions, thus forming a substantially regular octagon as a whole, are formed in the vicinity of the thin-walled portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 25/04 (2006.01); H01H 1/06 (2006.01); H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 13/702 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/041 (2013.01); H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2219/062 (2013.01); H01H 2221/012 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1478001 A1 20041117; EP 1478001 A4 20070502; EP 1478001 B1 20081112; EP 1478001 B8 20090218; AU 2003211219 A1 20030904; CN 1319092 C 20070530; CN 1630922 A 20050622; DE 60324662 D1 20081224; JP 2003242864 A 20030829; JP 3941924 B2 20070711; KR 100904667 B1 20090625; KR 20040083517 A 20041002; US 2005110805 A1 20050526; US 6958454 B2 20051025; WO 03069643 A1 20030821

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-12-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60324662

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60324662

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60324662 P 20081224

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO