Global Patent Index - EP 1478838 B1

EP 1478838 B1 2007-10-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIAGNOSING THE OPERATING CONDITION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS RECYCLING VALVE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIAGNOSING THE OPERATING CONDITION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS RECYCLING VALVE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSE DES BETRIEBSZUSTANDS EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR-ABGASRÜCKFÜHRVENTILS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE L'ETAT DE FONCTIONNEMENT D' UNE VANNE DE RECIRCULATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D' UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1478838 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 03732622 A

Priority

  • FR 0300601 W
  • FR 0202362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03071121A1] The invention concerns a method for diagnosing the operating condition of an internal combustion engine exhaust gas recycling valve (24) which consists in: acquiring a measurement value of a reference position of the recycling valve (24) at a predetermined time corresponding to a normally closed position of the valve, calculating the difference between the acquired reference value and a reference value acquired during the diagnostic cycle previously carried out and comparing the calculated difference with a threshold value for detecting opening of the valve (24).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02D 21/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 21/08 (2013.01); F02M 26/49 (2016.02); F02M 26/53 (2016.02); F02M 26/57 (2016.02); F02D 41/1446 (2013.01); F02D 41/2464 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0414 (2013.01); F02M 26/05 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 03071121 A1 20030828; DE 60316667 D1 20071115; DE 60316667 T2 20080717; EP 1478838 A1 20041124; EP 1478838 B1 20071003; ES 2290469 T3 20080216; FR 2836517 A1 20030829; FR 2836517 B1 20040528; JP 2005522613 A 20050728; JP 4277687 B2 20090610; US 2005145231 A1 20050707; US 7100585 B2 20060905

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290469 T3

2007-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60316667 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-10-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR