Global Patent Index - EP 1479009 A4

EP 1479009 A4 2009-02-25 - LOAD OPTIMIZATION

Title (en)

LOAD OPTIMIZATION

Title (de)

LASTOPTIMIERUNG

Title (fr)

OPTIMISATION DE CHARGE

Publication

EP 1479009 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03710842 A

Priority

  • US 0303297 W
  • US 35458802 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03067731A2] Methods, computer code, and means are described that can control load in a network. In some applications, the monetary cost of operating the network can be reduced. Utilization of links in the network can be monitored. A degree of suboptimality with respect to some criteria can be assessed. In some instances, the criteria could be based at least partly one or more monetary billing structures of some subset of two or more links [Figure 8]. A subset of the forwarding decisions of one or more forwarding nodes in the network can be adjusted automatically, based at least partly on the assessing. The adjustment can attempt to reduce the degree of suboptimality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/14 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 12/803 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/14 (2013.01); H04L 41/0213 (2013.01); H04L 41/0826 (2013.01); H04L 41/5009 (2013.01); H04L 41/5019 (2013.01); H04L 41/5029 (2013.01); H04L 43/0882 (2013.01); H04L 47/125 (2013.01); H04L 67/1002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03067731 A2 20030814; WO 03067731 A3 20031113; AU 2003214992 A1 20030902; AU 2003214992 A8 20030902; CA 2474501 A1 20030814; CA 2474501 C 20100720; CA 2704318 A1 20030814; CA 2704318 C 20130806; EP 1479009 A2 20041124; EP 1479009 A4 20090225; IL 163148 A 20090901

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-03-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090427

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090127

2006-02-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LLOYD, MICHAEL, A.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KARAM, MANSOUR, J.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VILLAVERDE, JOSE MIGUEL, PULIDO

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FINN, SEAN, P.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BALDONADO, OMAR, C.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCGUIRE, JAMES, G.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MADAN, HERBERT, S.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LLOYD, MICHAEL, A.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KARAM, MANSOUR, J.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VILLAVERDE, JOSE-MIGUEL, PULIDO

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FINN, SEAN, P.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BALDONADO, OMAR, C.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCGUIRE, JAMES, G.

2005-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MADAN, HERBERT, S.

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO