Global Patent Index - EP 1479261 B1

EP 1479261 B1 2007-10-17 - HEADPHONES

Title (en)

HEADPHONES

Title (de)

KOPFHÖRER

Title (fr)

CASQUE

Publication

EP 1479261 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03742560 A

Priority

  • DE 10207214 A
  • EP 0301729 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10207214C1] The headphone set has a curved hoop (4) fitting over the head, provided at either end (8) with an electroacoustic transducer (6), the hoop ends attached to the remainder of the hoop via pivot hinges and the electroacoustic transducers attached to the hoop ends via linkages (10) allowing them to pivot between a working position at 90 degrees to the plane of the hoop and a stowed position in the plane of the hoop, when the hoop ends are folded inwards.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/0335 (2013.01); H04R 1/1058 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 10207214 C1 20030424; DE 50308406 D1 20071129; EP 1479261 A1 20041124; EP 1479261 B1 20071017; JP 2005527134 A 20050908; JP 4221303 B2 20090212; US 2005244027 A1 20051103; US 2007297633 A1 20071227; US 7292703 B2 20071106; US 7940947 B2 20110510; WO 03071830 A1 20030828

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080124

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50308406 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060629

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR