Global Patent Index - EP 1479336 A3

EP 1479336 A3 2007-10-17 - Cleaning roller

Title (en)

Cleaning roller

Title (de)

Reinigungswalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1479336 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04011118 A

Priority

DE 10324107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1479336A2] A rotary cleaner (10) for a floor-cleaning machine comprises a cylindrical rotary body (16) in the machine which has a surrounding covering cleaning element of tube-shaped textile (14) which is removably attached to the body.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/19 (2006.01); A46B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4041 (2013.01); A46B 13/001 (2013.01); A47L 11/19 (2013.01); A46B 2200/3066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL HR LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1479336 A2 20041124; EP 1479336 A3 20071017; DE 10324107 A1 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110924

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071222

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK