Global Patent Index - EP 1479804 B1

EP 1479804 B1 2009-02-18 - Method for forming a sample warp and sample warper

Title (en)

Method for forming a sample warp and sample warper

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Musterkette und Musterkettenschärmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour obtenir une chaîne d'échantillonnage et ourdissoir d'échantillonnage

Publication

EP 1479804 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04007005 A

Priority

DE 10323382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1479804A2] Method for producing a warp sample in which at least a thread is used to form a winding group with a predefined number of windings around the circumference of a warp drum and on a transport surface arrangement on the warp drum. The thread is wound for at least one winding in the direction of a first end of the warp drum out of the winding group and for at least a further winding in the direction of the second end of the warp drum out of the winding group. An independent claim is made for a sample warping creel machine with a warp drum.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1479804 A2 20041124; EP 1479804 A3 20050427; EP 1479804 B1 20090218; DE 10323382 A1 20041230; DE 10323382 B4 20060914; DE 502004008997 D1 20090402; ES 2319985 T3 20090518; JP 2004346480 A 20041209; JP 4176045 B2 20081105

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-05-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2319985 T3

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008997 P 20090402

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2005-06-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK