Global Patent Index - EP 1479835 A3

EP 1479835 A3 2004-12-29 - A water tap

Title (en)

A water tap

Title (de)

Wasserauslaufarmatur

Title (fr)

Robinet d'eau

Publication

EP 1479835 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 04018648 A

Priority

  • EP 02258696 A
  • GB 0205628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1342855A1] A water tap (10) having a tap body (11), separate connections (12, 13, 14) on the tap body (11) for receiving supplies of hot water H, cold water C and filtered water F, a common discharge spout (15) mounted on the tap body (11), and valves (20, 24, 25) for controlling the supply of hot water H, cold water C and filtered water F from the tap body (11) to the discharge spout (15). The discharge spout (15) is provided internally with two separate discharge passages (16, 17) only which lead to a common discharge outlet (18) of the spout (15). The tap body (11) defines a route (19) for hot water only, under control of a hot water control valve (20), and which route (19) communicates with a dedicated first one (16) of the two separate discharge passages in the discharge spout (15) and which can therefore discharge hot water H only. The tap body (11) also defines a separate incoming route (21, 22) for each of the cold water C and the filtered water F, and a common outgoing route (23) for one or the other only of cold water C and filtered water F and such common outgoing route (23) communicating with a second of the two separate discharge passages (17) and which is dedicated to said common outgoing route (23). A diverter valve (24) is mounted on the tap body (11) and is operative selectively to control the communication of the incoming route (21) for cold water C, or the incoming route (22) for filtered water F, with the common outgoing route (23) depending upon whether cold water discharge or filtered water discharge is required. A dual purpose water control valve (25) is provided on the tap body (11) and which is operative to control the flow along said common outgoing route (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0404 (2013.01); E03C 1/04 (2013.01); E03C 2201/30 (2013.01); E03C 2201/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1342855 A1 20030910; EP 1479835 A2 20041124; EP 1479835 A3 20041229; GB 0205628 D0 20020424

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-10-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1342855 P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR