Global Patent Index - EP 1479891 A3

EP 1479891 A3 2004-12-22 - Device for working a throttle valve

Title (en)

Device for working a throttle valve

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Betätigung wenigstens einer Drosselklappe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour actionner une vanne à papillon

Publication

EP 1479891 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04010806 A

Priority

DE 10323121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1479891A2] The device has an actuator such as a throttle grip (102), at least one choke flap coupled to it and pivotable through an actuating angle and a mechanical conversion device (100) in the transmission path between the actuating device and the choke flap(s) for producing a progressive transmission ratio, at least in a lower load region. The mechanical conversion device contains a lifting element (114) joined to the choke flap and a cam plate (108) that interacts with it and that is operated by the actuating device..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/02; F02D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/04 (2006.01); F02M 19/12 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 19/12 (2013.01); F02D 11/02 (2013.01); F02D 11/04 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1479891 A2 20041124; EP 1479891 A3 20041222; EP 1479891 B1 20060719; DE 10323121 A1 20041216; DE 502004000975 D1 20060831

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160504

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160504

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160504

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004000975

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060923

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004000975 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-03-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK