Global Patent Index - EP 1480592 A1

EP 1480592 A1 2004-12-01 - VACUUM MASSAGE DEVICE COMPRISING THE AFFUSION OF WATER OR ANY OTHER SUITABLE LIQUID

Title (en)

VACUUM MASSAGE DEVICE COMPRISING THE AFFUSION OF WATER OR ANY OTHER SUITABLE LIQUID

Title (de)

VAKUUMMASSAGEVORRICHTUNG MIT AFFUSION VON WASSER ODER EINER ANDEREN GEEIGNETEN FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MASSAGE A DEPRESSION SOUS AFFUSION D'EAU OU TOUT AUTRE LIQUIDE APPROPRIE

Publication

EP 1480592 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 03743399 A

Priority

  • FR 0300683 W
  • FR 0202719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03073975A1] The invention relates to a vacuum massage device comprising the affusion of water or any other suitable liquid. The inventive device comprises an interchangeable massage head (2) which is connected to an upper body (1) by means of contacts (9, 10, 11) which are responsible for the inflow of a supplied pressurised fluid and the suction and inflow of an active product contained in a receptacle (17) on bearing rollers (3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8). The aforementioned pressurised fluid can be sent to the receptacle (17), thereby enabling the active liquid to be injected under pressure on to the rollers. Said fluid is distributed through channels (22, 23) which open out onto the periphery of the head (2) and into the suction chamber (21). According to the invention, the patient lies down on a special mattress (31) comprising a channel which is used to drain any liquid that is not absorbed by the vacuum. The invention relates to the industrial and commercial field relating to the production and distribution of devices and accessories that are generally intended for medical or paramedical offices, thermal centres, thalassotherapy institutes and hospital units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 9/00; A61H 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 7/00 (2006.01); A61H 9/00 (2006.01); A61H 15/00 (2006.01); A61H 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 9/005 (2013.01); A61H 7/008 (2013.01); A61H 9/0021 (2013.01); A61H 15/0092 (2013.01); A61H 2033/048 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0115 (2013.01); A61H 2201/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03073975A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03073975 A1 20030912; WO 03073975 A8 20041104; AU 2003246758 A1 20030916; CN 100400022 C 20080709; CN 1638713 A 20050713; EP 1480592 A1 20041201; FR 2836629 A1 20030905; FR 2836629 B1 20041022; JP 2005518870 A 20050630; KR 20040098656 A 20041120; US 2005119594 A1 20050602

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072889

2011-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110204

2010-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100923

2005-09-16 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072889

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIANA, ELIE

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LE STUM, CHRISTIAN

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK