Global Patent Index - EP 1480728 A2

EP 1480728 A2 2004-12-01 - ONLINE VEHICLE COLLECTION AND PLAY ACTIVITY

Title (en)

ONLINE VEHICLE COLLECTION AND PLAY ACTIVITY

Title (de)

ONLINE-FAHRZEUGSAMMLUNG UND -SPIELAKTIVITÄT

Title (fr)

ACTIVITE DE JEU ET DE COLLECTION DE VEHICULES EN LIGNE

Publication

EP 1480728 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 03713378 A

Priority

  • US 0303592 W
  • US 35500202 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03066178A2] An online game. More particularly, an online game in which virtual vehicles, particularly cars, may be selected, customized, and entered into races and other activities in an online community forum. In some embodiments, the online game may include a customization tutorial wherein virtual vehicles may be customized in a substantially reversible manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 13/00; A63F 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 9/24 (2006.01); A63F 13/12 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A63F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/803 (2014.09); A63F 13/12 (2013.01); A63F 13/335 (2014.09); A63F 13/69 (2014.09); A63F 2300/8017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 03066178 A2 20030814; WO 03066178 A3 20040226; AU 2003217335 A1 20030902; AU 2003217335 A2 20030902; CA 2475463 A1 20030814; CN 1649651 A 20050803; EP 1480728 A2 20041201; EP 1480728 A4 20060906; KR 20040081766 A 20040922; MX PA04007624 A 20050713

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072212

2007-10-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/00 20060101AFI20041129BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/24 20060101ALI20060801BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 13/12 20060101ALI20060801BHEP

2005-08-19 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1072212

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63F 13/00 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63F 9/24 B

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO