Global Patent Index - EP 1480729 A2

EP 1480729 A2 2004-12-01 - METHOD FOR CREATING A STAGE SCENE, AND STAGE ELEMENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CREATING A STAGE SCENE, AND STAGE ELEMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM GESTALTEN EINES BÜHNENBILDES UND BÜHNENELEMENT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FACONNAGE D'UN DECOR DE SCENE ET ELEMENT DE PLATE-FORME

Publication

EP 1480729 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 03743303 A

Priority

  • DE 10209482 A
  • EP 0300496 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03074143A2] The invention relates to a method for creating a stage scene with at least one stage element (R1 to R5) that can move on the stage (6). According to the invention, the at least one stage element (R1 to R5) is actively driven.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63J 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63J 1/02 (2006.01); A63B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63J 1/02 (2013.01); A63B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03074143A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 03074143 A2 20030912; WO 03074143 A3 20031127; AU 2003248971 A1 20030916; AU 2003248971 A8 20030916; DE 10209482 A1 20031002; DE 50303192 D1 20060608; EP 1480729 A2 20041201; EP 1480729 B1 20060503; ES 2260632 T3 20061101; US 2005246966 A1 20051110

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090120

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090121

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090121

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090120

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2260632 T3

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50303192 P 20060608

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-04-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO