Global Patent Index - EP 1480964 A1

EP 1480964 A1 2004-12-01 - INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENESE

Title (en)

INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENESE

Title (de)

ANGIOGENESE-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENESE

Publication

EP 1480964 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02795355 A

Priority

  • FR 0203721 W
  • FR 0114542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03040119A1] The invention concerns novel 1-oxa-spiro [2, 5] octan-6-ol of general formula (I), as well as their preparation method, and their use in pharmaceutical compositions for use in human or veterinary medicine, or in cosmetic compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 303/22; A61K 7/06; A61K 7/48; A61K 31/336; A61P 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 303/22 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 31/336 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/10 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C07B 53/00 (2006.01); C07D 301/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/4973 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); C07D 303/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 03040119A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 03040119 A1 20030515; WO 03040119 A8 20031127; AR 037341 A1 20041103; EP 1480964 A1 20041201; FR 2832149 A1 20030516; FR 2832149 B1 20060106; JP 2005519026 A 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 303/22 20060101AFI20071212BHEP

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GALDERMA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI