Global Patent Index - EP 1480995 A2

EP 1480995 A2 2004-12-01 - Cks1 INHIBITORS

Title (en)

Cks1 INHIBITORS

Title (de)

Cks1-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE CKS1

Publication

EP 1480995 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 03711050 A

Priority

  • US 0304550 W
  • US 35690602 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03068939A2] Inhibitors of human Cks1 and human Skp2, including antisense oligonucleotides, methods, and compositions specific for human Cks1 and human Skp2, are provided. Methods of using the compositions for modulating Cks1 expression and Skp2 expression, and for regulating cell growth, particularly tumor cell growth, are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/113 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03068939 A2 20030821; WO 03068939 A3 20031231; AU 2003215235 A1 20030904; AU 2003215235 A8 20030904; CA 2474844 A1 20030821; EP 1480995 A2 20041201; EP 1480995 A4 20060913; JP 2005523280 A 20050804

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091215

2007-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061205

2006-09-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/04 20060101AFI20040915BHEP

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/02 20060101ALI20060727BHEP

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20060727BHEP

2006-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20060727BHEP

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO