Global Patent Index - EP 1481516 A1

EP 1481516 A1 2004-12-01 - METHOD FOR SIGNALLING SERVICE REQUESTS IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SIGNALLING SERVICE REQUESTS IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALISIERUNG VON DIENSTEANFORDERUNGEN IN HETEROGENEN NETZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SIGNALISATION DE DEMANDES DE SERVICES DANS DES RESEAUX HETEROGENES

Publication

EP 1481516 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03714659 A

Priority

  • DE 0300609 W
  • DE 10209048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03075518A1] The invention relates to a method for a packet-oriented, connectionless, heterogeneous network, wherein a request message is sent from the source-side to the drain-side and a return message is sent from the drain-side to the source-side in order to request and make available the required network resources to ensure application-specific requests to the network service such as quality of service, for example. The request message, wherein the contributions of the individual networks can be added up, enables the network resources to be assigned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/54 (2013.01); H04L 12/801 (2013.01); H04L 12/913 (2013.01); H04L 12/915 (2013.01); H04L 12/927 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 47/785 (2013.01); H04L 47/15 (2013.01); H04L 47/18 (2013.01); H04L 47/70 (2013.01); H04L 47/724 (2013.01); H04L 47/801 (2013.01); H04L 47/805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 03075518 A1 20030912; DE 10209048 A1 20030918; EP 1481516 A1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080326

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071112

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR