Global Patent Index - EP 1481710 A1

EP 1481710 A1 2004-12-01 - Treadmill

Title (en)

Treadmill

Title (de)

Laufband

Title (fr)

Tapis roulant

Publication

EP 1481710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04102011 A

Priority

FI 20030787 A

Abstract (en)

The treadmill has a hand support structure (9), and an auxiliary frame (15) that is fastened to a frame (2). Arms (16) of the auxiliary frame extend parallel to the frame towards one end of the frame so that when the frame is lifted up, the auxiliary frame turns around a transverse shaft (14). Ends of the arms rest against floor and form points of support to keep the frame upright when the frame is lifted up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 22/02; A63B 22/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/02 (2013.01); A63B 2210/50 (2013.01); A63B 2225/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481710 A1 20041201; FI 20030787 A0 20030526; FI 20030787 A 20041127; US 2004242380 A1 20041202

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-03-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK