Global Patent Index - EP 1481713 A1

EP 1481713 A1 2004-12-01 - Platform for raising a snowboardbinding

Title (en)

Platform for raising a snowboardbinding

Title (de)

Plattform zur Erhöhung einer Snowboardbindung

Title (fr)

Plate-forme de surélévation d'une fixation pour une planche de glisse sur neige

Publication

EP 1481713 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 04101972 A

Priority

FR 0306483 A

Abstract (en)

The platform has a fixation unit mounted on a plate. The plate has two hooks reversibly cooperating with openings (23, 24) on front and back plates (9, 11) for positioning the plate and fixation unit at different predetermined longitudinal levels. The front and back plates are mounted on recesses (14) that are present on an upper surface of the platform, such that the hooks are placed in the recesses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481713 A1 20041201; EP 1481713 B1 20080220; AT 386575 T 20080315; DE 602004011857 D1 20080403; DE 602004011857 T2 20090212; FR 2855428 A1 20041203; FR 2855428 B1 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004011857 P 20080403

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEBORDE, HENRI-CHARLES

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUGEAS, THIERRY

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIS ROSSIGNOL

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2005-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK