Global Patent Index - EP 1481740 A2

EP 1481740 A2 2004-12-01 - Method and device for the wet cleaning of objects

Title (en)

Method and device for the wet cleaning of objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Flüssigreinigen von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer des objets par voie humide

Publication

EP 1481740 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04011770 A

Priority

DE 10324105 A

Abstract (en)

A washing process with use of both washing and rinsing liquids involves passing the used washing liquid through the rinsing liquid container before returning it to the washing liquid container. Washing objects with a liquid followed by rinsing, the washing and rinsing liquids having the same composition and being introduced in fresh form after removal of the dirt is such that: (a) the washing and rinsing liquids are withdrawn in first and second circuits from separate containers and, after use, are recycled to these containers; and (b) in a further step in a third circuit the washing liquid is removed and led through a dirt-removing device (60, 76) before being at least partially fed to the rinse container and then to the washing liquid container. An independent claim is also included for apparatus for the process comprising: (i) a washing and rinsing chamber (10); (ii) a washing liquid container (16); (iii) a rinsing liquid container (36); (iv) a device (60, 76) for removing dirt from the wash-active liquid; (v) a pump (22) moving the washing liquid from its container to the washing chamber; (vi) a pump (42) moving the rinsing liquid from its container to the rinsing chamber; (vii) a device (30, 32, 47) leading the wash-active liquid from the washing chamber (10) into the washing liquid container (16) during washing and from the rinsing chamber (10) to the rinse liquid container (36); and (viii) a device (56, 74) for leading the washing liquid from its container through dirt-removing device (60,76) and introducing at least a part of the cleaned liquid into the rinse liquid container and from there into the washing liquid container.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Flüssigreinigungsverfahren werden Gegenstände (12) zunächst mit Reinigungsflüssigkeit (18) gereinigt und dann mit Spülflüssigkeit (38) gespült. Die Reinigungsflüssigkeit (18) und die Spülflüssigkeit (38) haben zumindest annähernd die gleiche Zusammensetzung und enthalten neben Wasser eine organische Komponente derart und in einer Konzentration, dass die organische Komponente in gewissen Konzentrationen in Wasser löslich ist und die Flüssigkeit bei der bei der Reinigung herrschenden Temperatur im Zustand einer Mischungslücke mit einer wasserreichen kontinuierlichen Phase mit darin enthaltenen Tröpfchen einer organikreichen Phase vorliegt. Die die Reinigungsflüssigkeit (18) und die Spülflüssigkeit (38) bildende reinigungsaktive Flüssigkeit wird nach der Reinigung von Verschmutzungen befreit und erneut als Spülflüssigkeit bzw. Reinigungsflüssigkeit verwendet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; B08B 3/04; B08B 3/14; C11D 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/14 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B08B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/5022 (2013.01); B08B 3/02 (2013.01); B08B 3/04 (2013.01); B08B 3/12 (2013.01); B08B 3/14 (2013.01); C11D 7/5031 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481740 A2 20041201; EP 1481740 A3 20060419; DE 10324105 A1 20041223; DE 10324105 B4 20060614

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100819

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071122

2006-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/14 20060101AFI20060227BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/02 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/04 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11D 7/50 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK