Global Patent Index - EP 1481761 A1

EP 1481761 A1 2004-12-01 - Finishing machine for crankshafts and camshafts

Title (en)

Finishing machine for crankshafts and camshafts

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Finishbearbeitung von Wellen, insbesondere von Kurbel- und Nockenwellen

Title (fr)

Machine de finition pour vilebrequins et arbres à cames

Publication

EP 1481761 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 03011786 A

Priority

EP 03011786 A

Abstract (en)

Device for finishing shafts, especially crankshafts and camshafts, comprises at least one tool support (1) following the rotating motion of a workpiece (2) rotating about an axis of rotation (A), and at least one tool (4) arranged on a head part (3) of the tool support for finishing the workpiece. Two bearing shafts (5, 5') having a shape corresponding to that of the workpiece are arranged parallel to the workpiece. The bearing shafts are rotated about their axes (B, B') synchronously and in phase with the workpiece. The tool support is mounted on the peripheral surfaces (6, 6') of the bearing shafts which correspond to the surface (7) of the workpiece to be machined. Preferred Features: Several tool supports (1, 1', 1'') are arranged along the bearing shafts for simultaneous machining of the surfaces (7-9) of the workpiece.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Finishbearbeitung von Wellen, insbesondere von Kurbel- und Nockenwellen, mit mindestens einem Werkzeugträger (1), der der Umlaufbewegung eines um seine Rotationsachse (A) rotierenden Werkstückes (2) folgt und mit mindestens einem an einem Kopfstück (3) des Werkzeugträgers (1) angeordneten Werkzeug (4) zur Finishbearbeitung des Werkstückes (2). Erfindungsgemäß sind zwei Lagerwellen (5,5') parallel zum Werkstück (2) angeordnet, deren Gestalt dem Werkstück (2) entspricht. Die Lagerwellen (5,5') rotieren synchron und phasengleich zum Werkstück (2) um ihre Achsen (B,B'). Der Werkstückträger (1) ist an Umfangsflächen (6,6') der Lagerwellen (5,5') gelagert, die der zu bearbeitenden Fläche (7) des Werkstückes (2) entsprechen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/42; B24B 21/02; B24B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 21/02 (2006.01); B24B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/02 (2013.01); B24B 5/42 (2013.01); B24B 35/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 10009980 C1 20010823 - THIELENHAUS ERNST GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481761 A1 20041201; EP 1481761 B1 20060503; DE 50303194 D1 20060608

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-11-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50303194 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031129

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK