Global Patent Index - EP 1481903 A1

EP 1481903 A1 2004-12-01 - Apparatus for packaging panels

Title (en)

Apparatus for packaging panels

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von flachen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour emballer des panneaux

Publication

EP 1481903 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04425359 A

Priority

IT BO20030330 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus has a positioning station to position and check dimensions of incoming wooden panels (1). A cover forming station to form covers from packaging material for longitudinal, front and rear edges of the incoming panel. A covering station (10) has folders (10a, 10b) to fold projecting portions of lengths of material over the front and rear edges of the panel to cover the longitudinal edges of the panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/02 (2006.01); B65B 11/58 (2006.01); B65B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 49/08 (2013.01); B65B 5/024 (2013.01); B65B 11/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481903 A1 20041201; IT BO20030330 A1 20041127

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060425

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK