Global Patent Index - EP 1481936 A1

EP 1481936 A1 2004-12-01 - ELEVATOR CAR COMPRISING A CAR TOP HANDRAIL

Title (en)

ELEVATOR CAR COMPRISING A CAR TOP HANDRAIL

Title (de)

AUFZUGSKABINE MIT EINEM DARAUF ANGEORDNETEN HANDLAUF

Title (fr)

CAGE D'ASCENSEUR COMPRENANT UNE MAIN COURANTE PLACEE LA-DESSUS

Publication

EP 1481936 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02703934 A

Priority

JP 0202140 W

Abstract (en)

An extension handrail connected to a handrail unit, is displaceable between contraction and extension positions. In extension position of extension handrail, the handrail is extended to a range, by surrounding the handrail unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1481936 A1 20041201; EP 1481936 A4 20100324; EP 1481936 B1 20120201; CN 1283543 C 20061108; CN 1533357 A 20040929; JP 4161072 B2 20081008; JP WO2003074410 A1 20050623; KR 100567365 B1 20060403; KR 20040017847 A 20040227; WO 03074410 A1 20030912

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60242129

- Effective date: 20141107

2014-11-07 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60242129

2013-02-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60242129

- Effective date: 20121105

2013-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-04-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60242129

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2012-01-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELEVATOR CAR COMPRISING A CAR TOP HANDRAIL

2011-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100616

2010-03-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100219

2010-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 11/02 20060101AFI20030919BHEP

2010-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 5/00 20060101ALI20100212BHEP

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI