Global Patent Index - EP 1482099 A1

EP 1482099 A1 2004-12-01 - Water barrier

Title (en)

Water barrier

Title (de)

Wassersperre

Title (fr)

Barrière contre l'eau

Publication

EP 1482099 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04076480 A

Priority

  • NL 1023504 A
  • NL 1024011 A

Abstract (en)

Water barrier (1) for use inside a cavity wall, comprises an elongated component, separated in a transverse direction in a body part (5) which may be positioned against an inner wall (2) of the cavity wall, and an edge (6) part, which contacts an outer wall (3) of the cavity wall. (5) Has a rectangular cross section, with a thickness, which is very much larger than a thickness of (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/70; E04B 1/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/64 (2006.01); E04B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7046 (2013.01); E04B 1/644 (2013.01); E04B 1/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1482099 A1 20041201; NL 1024011 C2 20041124

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081008

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061121

2005-10-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050517

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK