Global Patent Index - EP 1482109 A2

EP 1482109 A2 2004-12-01 - Lock cylinder with key

Title (en)

Lock cylinder with key

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder mit Schlüssel

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique avec clef

Publication

EP 1482109 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04011787 A

Priority

DE 10324205 A

Abstract (en)

Lock cylinder with a key (2) comprises a cylinder core rotatably mounted in a cylinder housing and provided with a key channel. The key has a highly profiled rib (15) protruding over its broad side and provided with tumbler cut-outs interacting with the tips of tumbler pins (18a-c) consisting of non-rotating core pins and housing pins. The rib has several control tracks (16, 17) arranged next to each other in the key insertion direction which are selectively detected by individual tumbler pins according to an adapted tumbler pin tip design. An independent claim is also included for a key for the above lock cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Schließzylinder (1) mit passendem Schlüssel (2) beschrieben, bei dem der Schließzylinder (1) einen im Zylindergehäuse (1') drehbar gelagerten Zylinderkern (13) mit einem Schlüsselkanal (12) zum Eintritt des Schlüssels (2) aufweist, welcher Schlüssel (2) eine seine Breitseite überragende, höhenprofilierte Rippe (15) besitzt, deren Zuhaltungseinschnitte (29) mit den Spitzen von aus undrehbaren Kernstiften und Gehäusestiften bestehenden, in einer Reihe angeordneten Zuhaltungsstiften (18a) derart zusammenwirken, dass die in den die Drehfuge (F) zwischen Zylinderkern (13) und Zylindergehäuse (1') kreuzenden Kern-/Gehäusebohrungen geführten Zuhaltungsstifte (18a) so höheneingeordnet werden, dass die Trennfuge (T) zwischen Kern- und Gehäusestiften (19, 20) mit der Drehfuge (F) fluchtet. Die Rippe (15) weist mehrere in Schlüsseleinsteckrichtung nebeneinander verlaufende Steuerspuren auf, die zufolge einer angepassten Zuhaltungsstift-Spitzengestaltung selektiv von einzelnen der Zuhaltungsstifte (18a) abgetastet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/06; E05B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 19/06 (2006.01); E05B 27/00 (2006.01); E05B 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 27/0017 (2013.01); E05B 19/0017 (2013.01); E05B 19/0023 (2013.01); E05B 27/0078 (2013.01); E05B 2027/0025 (2013.01); E05B 2027/10 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7605 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7881 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1482109 A2 20041201; EP 1482109 A3 20051228; EP 1482109 B1 20080319; AT 389765 T 20080415; CN 1572998 A 20050202; DE 10324205 B3 20041021; DE 502004006545 D1 20080430; DK 1482109 T3 20080707; ES 2301895 T3 20080701; PT 1482109 E 20080523; SI 1482109 T1 20080831; TW 200427912 A 20041216; US 2004237614 A1 20041202

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170704

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170508

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160519

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20170216

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161118

2017-02-02 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 3563

- Effective date: 20160518

2017-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160518

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-29 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20150507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2015-02-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080401307

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-02-17 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E002027

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-08-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-07-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-08-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-02-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101230

2011-02-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-07-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-07-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20090512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2008-10-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E003610

2008-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-09-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-07-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-07-07 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2301895 T3

2008-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401307

2008-06-03 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2008-05-23 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080512

2008-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004006545 P 20080430

2008-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060728

2006-02-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK